FL H0643 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Now in Ways and Means Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certified organizations to receive refund of certain sales taxes collected for purposes relating to job training & employment services; specifies annual maximum allowable tax refund; provides requirements for receiving refund; authorizes DEO to certify organizations; authorizes DOR to audit any refund issued; provides applicable interest rate on overpayments & payments to ineligible organizations; requires certified organizations to provide an annual report to DEO.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Refund for Certified Job Training Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1098 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
S1112 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2120991Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback