FL H0643 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 312 (Ch. 2017-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 312 (Ch. 2017-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies that conduct lineups to follow specified procedures; requires eyewitnesses to sign acknowledgment that they have received instructions about lineup procedures; requires lineup administrators to document refusal of eyewitness to acknowledge receipt; specifies remedies for failing to adhere to procedures; requires Criminal Justice Standards & Training Commission to create educational materials & provide training.
Title
Eyewitness Identification
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 312 (Ch. 2017-91) |
2017-04-27 | House | Substituted CS/SB 312 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/20/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-16 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0312 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-91