FL H0643 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides & revises procedures & requirements for termination of condominium property; provides requirements for rejection of, & objection to, plan of termination; provides applicability; provides & revises requirements relating to partial termination of condominium property; authorizes plan of termination to be withdrawn, modified, or amended under certain conditions; revises & provides requirements relating to allocation of proceeds of sale of condominium property; revises requirements relating to right to contest plan of termination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Termination of a Condominium Association

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#316 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-175
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1172
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (742891)
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-09HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2015-04-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-08HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-30HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-27HouseCS/CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS/CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2015-03-16HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-16HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2015-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-11HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-02-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1172 (Same As) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 643 (Ch. 2015-175)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/643
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/966903/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/843011/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/106397/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/728811/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/847929/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/914985/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/869367/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/742891/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Amendment/624953/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Vote/HouseVote_h0643e1316.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0643/Vote/SenateVote_h0643e1027.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback