FL H0643 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies continuing education requirements for title insurance agents; specifies additional grounds to deny, suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew or continue license or appointment of title insurance agent or agency; requires attorney serving as title or real estate settlement agent to deposit & maintain certain funds in separate trust account & permit account to be audited by applicable title insurer, unless prohibited by rules of Florida Bar; provides procedures & requirements relating to approval or disapproval of title insurance forms by OIR; requires title insurance agencies & certain insurers to submit specified information to office to assist in analysis of title insurance premium rates, title search costs, & condition of title insurance industry; requires FSC to adopt rules.
Title
Title Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#771 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#771 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178 | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 939 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 939 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 817 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 817 | |
2012-02-22 | In Messages | |
2012-02-16 | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 639 | |
2012-02-16 | Read 3rd time -HJ 639 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-15 | Read 2nd time -HJ 621 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/12 | |
2012-02-11 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 581 | |
2012-02-10 | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 575 | |
2012-02-10 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-08 | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 -HJ 577 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 467 | |
2012-02-03 | Favorable by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 467 | |
2012-02-01 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 02/03/12, 9:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee -HJ 281 | |
2012-01-24 | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 243 | |
2012-01-23 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-12 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 64 | |
2011-11-21 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 64 | |
2011-11-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 777 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 782 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |