FL H0641 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes provisions relating to limited temporary cash assistance for children born to families receiving temporary cash assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited Temporary Cash Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-30HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1654 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
414115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback