FL H0635 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises positions related to tax credits for corporations providing or paying for child care; licensing standards for child care facilities; child care personnel; minimum standards; child care regulation; & large family child care homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care and Early Learning Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied on Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-22HouseOriginal reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-21House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-02-21HouseCS Filed
2024-02-21HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-02-21HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2024-02-20HouseFavorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
2024-02-16HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2024-01-23House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-01-23HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2024-01-23HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2024-01-23HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2024-01-22HouseCS Filed
2024-01-22HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-01-22HouseReported out of Ways & Means Committee
2024-01-22HouseFavorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
2024-01-18HouseAdded to Ways & Means Committee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-30HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-11-30HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2023-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S820 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S596 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1026 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
H1353 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
170201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2110254Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4023115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5611214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62770161Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/Amendment/062289/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/Analyses/h0635.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/Analyses/h0635a.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/Analyses/h0635b.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/635/Analyses/h0635c.APC.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=70224&IsPCB=0&BillId=79198
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=72140&IsPCB=0&BillId=79198

Bill Comments

feedback