FL H0627 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames Brevard Community College as "Eastern Florida State College."
Title
Brevard Community College
Sponsors
Rep. John Tobia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45) |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/14/13, 1:30 pm, Reed Hal |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 02/19/13, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0434 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45)
S1514 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-45, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2013-225), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), CS/SB 1096 (Ch. 2013-35), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
S1514 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-45, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2013-225), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), CS/SB 1096 (Ch. 2013-35), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/627 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0627/BillText/Filed/PDF |