FL H0621 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises amount & conditions of payment of death benefits; requires payment be made to beneficiary through process set out by DMA; removes provisions relating to payment when beneficiary is not designated; requires proof of residency or duty post to be provided to DMA; requires DMA to request CFO to draw warrant for payment of benefits from General Revenue Fund.
Title
Death Benefits for Active Duty Servicemembers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#318 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#318 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Chapter No. 2023-163 | |
2023-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-01 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1094 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-12 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-28 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2023-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-14 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1094 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 621 (Ch. 2023-163)