FL H0621 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exception to prohibition on possessing firearms & specified devices on school property for authorized concealed weapon & firearm licensees who are designated by school principals & district school superintendents; provides requirements for designees; requires district school boards to formulate & prescribe policies & procedures for active shooter & hostage situations; requires that active shooter training for each school be conducted by law enforcement agency designated as first responders to school's campus; requires district school boards & private school principals & governing boards allow campus tours by such agency; permits district school boards to commission one or more school safety officers on each school's campus; requires district school superintendents to provide recommendations on school safety & security to law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25HouseNow in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1236 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3
H7101 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback