FL H0621 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes sheriff to transfer funds among specified budget appropriations for certain expenditures.
Title
Sheriff Budgets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0652 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/621 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0621/BillText/Filed/PDF |