FL H0613 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to State Constitution to allow proposal of laws by initiative without legislative or gubernatorial approval; prescribe requirements for subject matter, proposal, & approval of such initiatives; require extraordinary vote of each house of Legislature to amend or repeal laws approved by voters; require Legislature to adopt procedures for initiatives; provide for Supreme Court review of initiative petitions; require ballot statements for such initiatives to include statement of economic impact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislation by Initiative

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Rules and Policy Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1702 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback