FL H0613 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Postpones dates by which domestic wastewater facilities must meet more stringent treatment & management requirements; revises definition of "functioning reuse system" & changes term "facility's actual flow on an annual basis" to "baseline flow"; revises plan requirements for elimination of ocean outfalls; authorizes certain utilities to enter into binding agreements to share or transfer responsibility for meeting reuse requirements, etc.
Title
Domestic Wastewater Discharged/Ocean Outfalls
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Rep. Luis Garcia [D] | Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D] |
Rep. Carlos Trujillo [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#220 (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-20 | In Messages | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 653 | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 634 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2 -HJ 589 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-31 | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-03-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 390 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/28/11, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 54 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 54 | |
2011-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0796 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration