FL H0611 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes law enforcement officer to arrest person without warrant upon probable cause that person committed criminal racing violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Racing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#142 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Chapter No. 2019-125
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 572
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 116
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-25SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-20HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-20HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2019-03-20HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S116 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 611 (Ch. 2019-125)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback