FL H0607 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to authorize next phase of Everglades restoration.
Title
Comprehensive Everglades Restoration Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-13 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/12/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/607 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0607/BillText/Filed/PDF |