FL H0605 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties & local enforcement agencies to post all types of building permit applications on their websites; specifies format in which completed applications must be submitted & format in which payments, attachments, & drawings may be submitted.
Title
Applications for Building Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129) |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0535 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |