FL H0585 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates second Monday in October of each year as "Sir Lancelot Jones Day" in Miami-Dade & Monroe Counties; encourages public officials, schools, private organizations, & citizens in Miami-Dade & Monroe Counties to commemorate occasion.
Title
Legal Holidays & Special Observances/Sir Lancelot Jones Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-04-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-01 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0946 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages