FL H0579 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain entities created under Interlocal Cooperation Act of 1969 to submit financial statements for certain electric power projects to specified public entities.
Title
Municipal Power Regulation
Sponsors
House Energy and Utilities Subcommittee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/16, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 6 NAYS 5 |
2016-01-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-11-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0840 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |