FL H0577 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement & correctional agencies to collect data concerning use of force incidents; provides for suspension of funding for local law enforcement agencies that fail to comply with data requirements; requires data to be collected in compliance with federal standards; requires FDLE to maintain statewide database with data & publish database on its website; requires FDLE to annually submit report; requires each law enforcement agency to annually review its use of force policy & require each of its officers to attend training class.
Title
Law Enforcement Officer Use of Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S454 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
S740 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
S1866 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H1451 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H1525 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
S740 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
S1866 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H1451 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H1525 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
900 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1719 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 6872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/577 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/577/BillText/Filed/PDF |