FL H0577 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes student to use credit earned upon completion of apprenticeship or preapprenticeship program to satisfy specified high school graduation requirements; requires SBE to approve & identify registered apprenticeship & preapprenticeship programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#612 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-154
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for SB 856
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/18/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-10HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S856 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 577

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback