FL H0573 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain persons who participate in peer support communication with a first responder from testifying or divulging specified information under certain circumstances; specifying that an allegation or complaint of misconduct against a law enforcement officer or a correctional officer may originate from any source; authorizing law enforcement and correctional agencies to request a separate agency to conduct an investigation of a complaint under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Responders and Correctional Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#750 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#648 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chapter No. 2020-104
2020-06-27 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (910716)
2020-03-12HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 733
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-11SenateAmendment(s) adopted (910716)
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 160
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-10SenateReceived
2020-03-10SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-10SenateIn Messages
2020-03-10HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (877421)
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-02-12HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-02HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-31HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-30HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-29HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-15HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S160 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 573
H453 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S884 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112533Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/Amendment/746281/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/Vote/HouseVote_h00573c2648.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/Vote/SenateVote_h00573e1015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/573/Vote/HouseVote_h00573e1750.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback