FL H0571 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 1:00 pm House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes land authorities to assist counties in which they are located with certain activities addressing flooding & sea-level rise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers of Land Authorities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-12HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-19HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-11-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S442 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800666Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback