FL H0559 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes nursing home facility to establish & implement institutional formulary; requires facility to maintain written policies & procedures for institutional formulary & make available to AHCA, upon request; provides requirements relating to prescribers; prohibits facility from taking adverse action against prescriber or resident under certain circumstances; authorizes pharmacist to substitute medicinal drugs under institutional formulary established by facility under certain circumstances.
Title
Institutional Formularies Established by Nursing Home Facilities
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Rep. Charlie Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#603 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#603 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-103 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-12-11 | House | Favorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1020 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 559
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |