FL H0559 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for determining capacity of facilities in certain schools as reported in Florida Inventory of School Houses; requires Commissioner of Education to grant exemption from SREF to district school board under certain circumstances.
Title
Public Educational Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Now in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 11:30 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0642 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |