FL H0551 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires community transportation coordinators to increase & support programs that enhance cross-county mobility for specified purposes for transportation disadvantaged; requires coordinating boards to evaluate multicounty or regional transportation opportunities to increase & support such programs.
Title
Transportation Disadvantaged
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#440 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-13 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S76 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
427 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
427 | 0157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |