FL H0551 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for building plans, blueprints, schematic drawings, diagrams, & other construction documents received by certain agencies which depict internal layout or structural elements of certain health care facilities; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#621 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-53
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 906
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-12HouseCS/CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS/CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-12-08HouseNow in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2017-12-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health Innovation Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S906 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 551

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback