FL H0551 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires vendors of copy machines to provide specified warning labels & information with machines; requires rulemaking; requires vendors of copy machines to erase or otherwise render non-recreatable any records stored in memory of copy machine; provides requirements for financial institutions concerning copy machines; prohibits specified acts concerning required warning labels; provides for recovery of punitive damages for certain violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Copy Machines/Photocopiers/Fax Machines/Printers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 51
2011-02-16 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 51
2011-01-28 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1326 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501974Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback