FL H0549 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for site-specific location information of endangered & threatened species; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Site-specific Location Information of Endangered and Threatened Species
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#627 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#627 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-129 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 812 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S812 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 549