FL H0549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires minimum of 2 hours of continuing education on prescribing of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Education for Dentists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#79 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-23SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 405
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenateSubstituted for SB 648
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-06HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S648 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 549

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4660135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback