FL H0549 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "membership association"; requiring a membership association to file an annual report with the Legislature; specifying required elements of the report; prohibiting a membership association from expending moneys received from public funds on litigation against the state; requiring certain membership association dues to be assessed for each specified public officer; providing conditions for nonpayment of dues, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership Associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#283 (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Community Affairs
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 85 NAYS 28
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (260019, 487727, 610773)
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-27HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-03-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-26HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-24HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-03-23HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2015-03-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-19HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 7
2015-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-03-09HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-09HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2015-03-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-04HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2015-02-11HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-02-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1114 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112328Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
617221Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/549
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/641477/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/372323/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/530217/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/487727/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/610773/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Amendment/260019/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0549/Vote/HouseVote_h0549e1283.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback