FL H0549 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Select Committee on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for relief of James Joseph Richardson by State of Florida; provides for appropriation to compensate James Joseph Richardson for length of time in prison sustained as result of his wrongful conviction by the state. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/James Joseph Richardson/DOC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Select Committee on Claim Bills
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Select Committee on Claim Bills; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2013-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0194 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback