FL H0539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to support tax-relief provisions of H.R. 5699 & S. 3934, initiated in 111th Congress, or similar legislation, relating to Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill of 2010.
Title
Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill/Tax Relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable by Federal Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 188 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 50 | |
2011-03-07 | On Committee agenda-- Federal Affairs Subcommittee, 03/09/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Federal Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 50 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0214 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/539 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0539/BillText/Filed/HTML |