FL H0537 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires health insurance & group, blanket, and franchise health insurance policies & health maintenance contracts to provide coverage for refills of prescription eye drops under specified conditions; provides that policy cost-sharing requirements apply to such coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Benefit Coverage for Prescription Eye Drop Refills

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S552 (Similar To) 2017-10-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S924 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627662Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback