FL H0533 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes city to enter into supplemental contract with certain firefighters & police officers to comply with specified law; authorizes board to adopt rules under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Tampa, Hillsborough County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#303 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-197
2017-06-06 Approved by Governor
2017-05-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-04HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-04SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/04/17
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2017-04-27SenateIn Messages
2017-04-27HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-06HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-20HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-20HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-08HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2017-03-08HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback