FL H0525 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes name of "Florida Keys Community College" to "The College of Florida Keys" & name of "North Florida Community College" to "North Florida College.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renaming Of Florida College System Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-78
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-02SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted for SB 720
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateReceived
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/19, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-13HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S720 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 525

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback