FL H0523 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes district to establish, own construct, operate, manage, & maintain hospitals, facilities, & services within & beyond boundaries of district under certain conditions; provides ad valorem taxes and non-ad valorem special assessments be expended only within the boundaries of district; authorizes district to contract to carry out provisions of act; authorizes district to own & operate certain facilities & provide certain services throughout the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Volusia County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#112 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Approved by Governor
2019-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-17SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2019-04-03HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-04-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-02HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/02/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-21HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-20HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback