FL H0521 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides tax credits for certain farmers; revises rate of reimbursement & allocation of funds relating to free & reduced-price meals; removes exemption from requirement to implement free breakfast meals; provides funds for certain breakfast meals; authorizes school districts to use share tables; directs DACS, in collaboration with DOH, to distribute share table information; requires school districts to implement specified practices; directs DACS to create specified campaign, allocate additional reimbursements for school meals, conduct food access study, & develop Florida Gleaning Support Grant Program; provides appropriations; authorizes DACS to contract with third-party vendor & to adopt rules.
Title
School Food and Nutrition Services
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] | Rep. Bruce Antone [D] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/521 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/521/BillText/Filed/PDF |