FL H0521 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes local government to allow certain permittee-responsible mitigation on lands purchased & owned by local government for conservation purposes; provides exception to provisions prohibiting governmental entity from creating or providing mitigation for project other than its own unless certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetland Mitigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#109 (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 72 NAYS 42
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-15HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-15HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2019-03-15HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S532 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3734135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback