FL H0521 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits local governments from requiring permits or other approvals for tree & vegetation maintenance within certain rights-of-way managed by WMDs, water control districts, or special districts; requires such districts to provide certain notice before conducting such maintenance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tree and Vegetation Maintenance within Established Flood and Drainage Rights-of-Way

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#772 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 2
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-31HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-31HouseCS referred to Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-31HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
2018-01-30HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-29HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-01-25HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S574 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58937Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback