FL H0521 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Preempts to state regulation of certain hoisting equipment; provides that act does not apply to regulation of elevators or to airspace height restrictions.
Title
State Preemption of the Regulation of Hoisting Equipment
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | House Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | House Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#869 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#869 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1004 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Budget -SJ 1004 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Budget -SJ 817 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 817 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 774 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 774 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 721 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 451 | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 313 | |
2012-02-01 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS/CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 222 | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee -HJ 246 | |
2012-01-13 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-11 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 228 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 53 | |
2012-01-09 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-11-04 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 54 | |
2011-10-31 | Filed |