FL H0521 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Abrogates future repeal of Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children; deletes provisions relating to disclosure of information & records & closure of meetings by Interstate Commission on Educational Opportunity for Military Children; provides for future legislative review & repeal of compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compact/Educational Opportunity/Military Children [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0871 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-52
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -SJ 00762; Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00762
2010-04-22 In Messages; Received -SJ 00753; Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00753; Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00749; Substituted for SB 1060 -SJ 00749; Read 2nd time -SJ 00749
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -HJ 00859; Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 00859
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00807
2010-03-17 Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00312; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00312
2010-03-15 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 03/17/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-03 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00207
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Education Policy Council -HJ 00048; On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall; Favorable by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -HJ 00170; Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00170; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-02-18 Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
2010-02-17 Favorable by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2010-01-15 Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Education Policy Council
2009-12-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1060 (Similar To) 2010-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00749; Substituted HB 521 -SJ 00749; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 521 (Ch. 2010-52) -SJ 00749

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100039Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback