FL H0513 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides corporate income tax credit for employment of person previously convicted of felony; provides requirements to receive credit; provides exceptions for certain felons.
Title
Employment of Felons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0368 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/513 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0513/BillText/Filed/PDF |