FL H0511 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-242

Summary

Creates independent special district to provide children's services in county; provides for governing board, membership, terms, powers, & duties; authorizes reimbursement for per diem & travel expenses; requires certain reports & audits; specifies fiscal year; provides financial requirements & budget procedures; authorizes levy of ad valorem assessments & provides millage cap; requires surety bond of certain persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collier County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-242
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00944; Read 3rd time -SJ 00944; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00944
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00866; Referred to Rules -SJ 00866
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00904; Read 3rd time -HJ 00904; CS passed; YEAS 104 NAYS 3 -HJ 00904
2010-04-19 CS read 1st time on 04/19/10 -HJ 00758; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00789
2010-04-16 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-12 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00661
2010-04-08 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 11 NAYS 3 -HJ 00648; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -HJ 00643; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-04-06 PCS on Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 04/08/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00048
2010-01-15 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-12-17 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1162 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 511 (Ch. 2010-242)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback