FL H0503 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates, amends, & revises numerous provisions relating to: development, construction, operating, & building permits; permit application requirements & procedures, including waivers, variances, & revocation; local government comprehensive plans & plan amendments; programmatic general permits & regional general permits; permits for projects relating to stormwater management systems, coastal construction, dredge & fill activities, intermodal logistics centers & commercial & industrial development; sanitary program surveys of certain water systems; innocent victim petroleum storage system restoration, ambient air quality & water quality standards, & solid waste disposal; sale of unblended gasoline for certain uses; exemption from payment to authorizing agencies for use of certain extensions; provides 2-year permit extension.
Title
Environmental Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#900 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#900 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 981 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 980 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 842 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 842 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 792 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 790 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 733 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-03 | CS/CS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 462 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 467 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/01/12, 8:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-26 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-25 | CS/CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 278 | |
2012-01-25 | CS/CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 235 | |
2012-01-17 | CS/CS by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 222 | |
2012-01-17 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-11 | CS/CS by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 -HJ 229 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 168 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 51 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 8:30 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-04 | Now in Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee -HJ 170 | |
2011-12-29 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-12-06 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 178 | |
2011-11-29 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-11-04 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 52 | |
2011-10-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 30715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 1838 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 853 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |