FL H0501 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DVA to contract with state university or Florida College System institution to furnish specified alternative treatment options for veterans; provides university or institution responsibilities; provides requirements for provision of alternative treatment options & related assessment data; provides eligibility requirements; requires direction & supervision by certain licensed providers; requires annual report to Governor & Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Treatment Options for Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#171 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chapter No. 2019-148
2019-06-26 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1518
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-02HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-21HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1518 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 501

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback