FL H0499 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to restrictions on sale by certain licensed alcoholic beverage vendors of merchandise other than specifically authorized types of merchandise & restrictions on direct access to such vendor's place of business; prohibits EBT cards from being used or accepted at locations operated as package store; provides exception to employment restrictions on vendors licensed under Beverage Law for persons under age of 18 years who are employed by specified vendors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Package Stores

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0468 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H0107 (Similar To) 2015-04-14 - Unfavorable by Regulatory Affairs Committee, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 10, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 186 (Ch. 2015-12)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56504Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback