FL H0489 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates SP4 Thomas Berry Corbin Memorial Highway & U.S. Navy BMC Samuel Calhoun Chavous, Jr. Memorial Highway in Dixie County; designates Marine Lance Corporal Brian R. Buesing Memorial Highway, United States Army Sergeant Karl A. Campbell Memorial Highway, & U.S. Army SPC James A. Page Memorial Highway in Levy County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 47
2011-02-07 Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 47
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0908 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback