FL H0487 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates certain requirements for residential treatment centers that provide services to commercially sexually exploited children.
Title
Residential Treatment Center Requirements
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Robert Olszewski [R] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#620 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/01/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-25 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-10-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S634 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |