FL H0481 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revives & renames Florida Enterprise Act as Florida Opportunity Act; revives & amends substantive procedures formerly related to enterprise zones; defines "opportunity zone"; provides mechanisms for opportunity zones to receive specified state incentives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opportunity Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1408 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
159803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1632514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195099Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220182Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880659Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000552Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000677Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000726Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29006561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33963Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback