FL H0481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides definitions applicable to real estate brokers, sales associates, & schools; revises exemptions from regulations of real estate profession; requires landlords & leading agents to be licensed real estate sales associates.
Title
Real Estate Profession Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
475 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/481 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0481/BillText/Filed/PDF |