FL H0475 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Florida Public School Tax Credit Program; provides for credits against corporate income tax for contributions to public schools for specified purposes; authorizes public schools to determine how to use undesignated contributions; requires public schools to report specified information to DOR; limits total annual amount of credits; requires department to apportion dollar amount of tax credits to each school board receiving eligible contributions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax Credits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 45
2011-02-07 Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee -HJ 46
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1542 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2201877Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback